EP0533145 - Air flow assisted material removal method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerr, Roger Stanley, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Auer, Scott Lanning, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Heizyk, Dennis Walter, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/12] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115859.8 | 16.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | US19910762834 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: US 762834 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0533145 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/22, B65H29/56 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
B65H29/56 (EP);
B65H5/226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL [1993/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Abnehmen eines Gegenstandes mittels eine Luftstroms | [1993/12] | English: | Air flow assisted material removal method and apparatus | [1993/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour enlever un produit avec un courant d'air | [1993/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/35] | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4237466 |