EP0534307 - N-allyl-N-dialkoxyethyl amide or amine monomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 501 Silverside Road Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | [1993/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leighton, John C. 2 Patriots Way Flanders, New Jersey 07836 / US | 02 /
Neigel, Dennis 610 Fox Hollow Lane Salisbury, North Carolina 28146 / US | 03 /
Iovine, Carmine P. 263 Withe Oak Ridge Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [1995/29] |
Former [1993/13] | 01 /
Neigel, Dennis 610 Fox Hollow Lane Salisbury, North Carolina 28146 / US | ||
02 /
Iovine, Carmine P. 263 Withe Oak Ridge Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | |||
03 /
Leighton, John C. 2 Patriots Way Flanders, New Jersey 07836 / US | Representative(s) | Hagemann, Heinrich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/13] | Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115864.8 | 16.09.1992 | [1993/13] | Priority number, date | US19910764745 | 24.09.1991 Original published format: US 764745 | [1993/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0534307 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0534307 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0534307 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/18, C07C217/40, C08F26/02, D04H1/64, C08J5/04 | [1993/13] | CPC: |
C07C233/18 (EP,US);
C07C217/40 (EP,US);
C08F26/02 (EP,US);
D06M15/227 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
D06M15/285 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/13] | Title | German: | N-Allyl-N-Dialkoxyethylamid oder -amin-Monomere | [1993/13] | English: | N-allyl-N-dialkoxyethyl amide or amine monomers | [1993/13] | French: | Monomères de N-allyl-N-dialkoxyéthylamide ou -amine | [1993/13] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 27.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0215245 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [A]EP0312008 (NAT STARCH CHEM CORP [US]); | [A]EP0302521 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) |