EP0535470 - Succinimide derivatives of 2,5-dimercapto-1,3,4-thiadiazole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, INC. 30 Winfield Street Norwalk Connecticut 06856-5150 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states R.T. VANDERBILT COMPANY, Inc. 30 Winfield Street Norwalk, Connecticut 06856-5150 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karol, Thomas J. 33 Harbor View Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06854 / US | [1993/14] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1994/05] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1993/14] | Redies, Bernd, Dr. rer. nat. COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116013.1 | 18.09.1992 | [1993/14] | Priority number, date | US19910770000 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: US 770000 | [1993/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0535470 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0535470 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/12, C07D417/14, C10M135/36 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP);
C10M135/36 (EP);
C10M2219/10 (EP);
C10M2219/102 (EP);
C10M2219/104 (EP);
C10M2219/106 (EP);
C10N2050/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/14] | Title | German: | Succinimidderivate von 2,5-Dimercapto-1,3,4-thiadiazol | [1997/47] | English: | Succinimide derivatives of 2,5-dimercapto-1,3,4-thiadiazole | [1993/14] | French: | Dérivés de succineimide de 2,5-dimércapto-1,3,4-thiadiazole | [1993/14] |
Former [1993/14] | Succinimidderivate von 2,5-Dimencapto-1,3,4-Thiadiazol | Examination procedure | 05.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 30.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.1997 | CH | 19.11.1997 | DK | 19.11.1997 | ES | 19.11.1997 | GR | 19.11.1997 | LI | 19.11.1997 | PT | 19.02.1998 | SE | 19.02.1998 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
GR | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/45] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
CH | 19.11.1997 | ||
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
LI | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
PT | 19.02.1998 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
DK | 19.11.1997 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 19.11.1997 | |
DK | 19.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2237957 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0218816 (PENNWALT CORP [US]) |