EP0533208 - PSK demodulator with feedback circuit for correcting phase and freqency errors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichiyoshi, Osamu, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116142.8 | 21.09.1992 | [1993/12] | Priority number, date | JP19910239968 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: JP 23996891 | [1993/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0533208 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0533208 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0533208 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/22 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
H04L27/2332 (EP,US);
H04L2027/003 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0057 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/12] | Title | German: | PSK-Demodulator mit Rückkopplungsschaltung zur Phasen- und Frequenzkorrektur | [1993/12] | English: | PSK demodulator with feedback circuit for correcting phase and freqency errors | [1993/12] | French: | Démodulateur de phase à circuit de rétroaction, pour la correction d'erreur de phase et de fréquence | [1993/12] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/34] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2211703 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0355587 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [A]US4926499 (KOBAYASHI NAOYA [JP], et al) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS vol. 32, no. 8, August 1984, NEW YORK, US, pages 935 - 947 NATALI F. D.: 'AFC TRACKING ALGORITHMS' | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS - ICC'90, 15-19 APRIL 1990, ATLANTA, GA vol. 2, pages 365 - 369 OHSAWA T.: 'WIDE RANGE AND SHORT TIME PULL-IN COHERENT DEMODULATION METHOD FOR | [A] - INTELSAT / IECE / ITE - THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS, 11-13 NOVEMBER 1975, KYOTO, JAPAN pages 99 - 104 ASAHARA M. ET AL.: 'ANALYSIS OF CARRIER RECOVERY ADOPTING A NARROW BAND PASSIVE FILTER WITH AFC LOOP' |