EP0538632 - Plier handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIRMA HANS PLIER Nüdelshalbach 79 42855 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states FIRMA HANS PLIER Nüdelshalbach 79 D-42855 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klose, Odo Dr. Friedrich- Engels-Allee 254 W-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Postfach 13 01 13 42028 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 42028 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1993/17] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 D-42028 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 92116224.4 | 23.09.1992 | [1993/17] | Priority number, date | DE19910012630U | 10.10.1991 Original published format: DE 9112630 U | [1993/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0538632 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B25G1/10 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
B25B7/00 (EP);
B25G1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/17] | Title | German: | Zangen-Handgriff | [1993/17] | English: | Plier handle | [1993/17] | French: | Poignée de pince | [1993/17] | File destroyed: | 22.02.2003 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/31] | 11.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3019734 ; | [X]DE3716583 ; | [A]DE8806913U ; | [A]EP0228032 ; | [A]GB191513478 |