EP0523757 - Portable bridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fried. Krupp AG Hoesch-Krupp Altendorfer Strasse 103 45143 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states Fried. Krupp AG Hoesch-Krupp Altendorfer Strasse 103 D-45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states Fried. Krupp AG Altendorfer Strasse 103 D-45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kahmann, Rüdiger Kantstrasse 11 W-4130 Moers / DE | 02 /
Wiedeck, Hans-Norbert Mendener Strasse 82 W-4330 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [1993/03] | Application number, filing date | 92116939.7 | 07.08.1987 | [1993/03] | Priority number, date | DE19863628273 | 20.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3628273 | [1993/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0523757 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0523757 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0523757 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E01D15/12 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
E01D15/133 (EP);
E01D15/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1993/03] | Title | German: | Verlegbare Brücke | [1993/03] | English: | Portable bridge | [1993/03] | French: | Pont déplaçable | [1995/39] |
Former [1993/03] | Pont deplaçable | Examination procedure | 07.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87111453.4 / EP0256446 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2324646 (KRUPP GMBH); | [A]GB1494494 (BULSON P, et al); | [A]DE2807859 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT); | [AD]DE2846182 (PORSCHE AG) |