EP0550800 - Molded product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/28] | Method for manufacturing molded products using an extruder and a mold, and equipment to be used therewith | ||
[1997/15] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEYER INDUSTRIEPRODUKTE GmbH &Co. KG Am Buchenmaar 5 D-52372 Kreuzau / DE | [1993/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beyer, Dieter Am Günster 15 W-5166 Kreuzau-Stockheim / DE | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/01] |
Former [1997/38] | Kohlmann, Kai, Dipl.-Ing., et al Wallstrasse 46 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [1997/09] | Castell, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Schillingstrasse 335 52355 Düren / DE | ||
Former [1995/49] | Aubele, Karl B. Bavariastrasse 1 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/28] | Liermann, Manfred Schillingsstrasse 335 D-52355 Düren / DE | Application number, filing date | 92117157.5 | 08.10.1992 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | DE19924200400 | 10.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4200400 | DE19924213951 | 20.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4213951 | [1993/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0550800 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0550800 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550800 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00, B29C47/06 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
B29B17/0412 (EP);
E04D1/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP);
B29C48/12 (EP);
E04C3/29 (EP);
E04D1/2916 (EP,US);
E04D1/30 (EP,US);
B29K2105/065 (EP);
B29K2105/16 (EP);
B29L2031/104 (EP);
E04D2001/302 (EP,US);
E04D2001/303 (EP,US);
E04D2001/305 (EP,US);
E04D2001/307 (EP,US);
E04D2001/309 (EP,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | Formteil | [1997/15] | English: | Molded product | [1997/15] | French: | Produit moulé | [1997/15] |
Former [1993/28] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formteilen unter Verwendung eines Extruders und einer Form sowie Anlage zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | ||
Former [1993/28] | Method for manufacturing molded products using an extruder and a mold, and equipment to be used therewith | ||
Former [1993/28] | Méthode de manufacture de produits moulés par extrusion-moulage, et dispositif pour telle méthode | Examination procedure | 07.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.12.1997
ADMISSIBLE Schnause, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bismarckallee 2 24105 Kiel / DE Opponent's representative Hefel, Herbert Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [1998/09] | 10.02.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.06.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.12.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 28.06.1995 | [1995/37] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 09.04.1997 | GB | 09.04.1997 | IT | 09.04.1997 | SE | 09.07.1997 | GR | 11.07.1997 | LU | 08.10.1997 | ES | 09.10.1998 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/38] | DK | 09.04.1997 | |
GB | 09.04.1997 | ||
IT | 09.04.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
LU | 08.10.1997 | ||
ES | 09.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 09.04.1997 | |
DK | 09.04.1997 | ||
GB | 09.04.1997 | ||
IT | 09.04.1997 | ||
LI | 09.04.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
LU | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [2000/07] | DK | 09.04.1997 | |
GB | 09.04.1997 | ||
IT | 09.04.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
LU | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 09.04.1997 | |
GB | 09.04.1997 | ||
IT | 09.04.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 09.04.1997 | |
GB | 09.04.1997 | ||
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | GB | 09.04.1997 | |
SE | 09.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | GB | 09.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2558987 (INST NAT RECH CHIMIQUE); | [X]DD233525 (SPANPLATTENWERK GOTHA VEB [DD]); | [X]EP0334420 (TECNOCOLOR S A S DI CELEBRANO [IT]); | [X]FR2648371 (SECOMI SARL [FR]); | [AD]DE3939189 (REMAPLAN ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) | [AD] - TENNER 'Verwerten van Thermoplastischen Kunststoffabf{llen' 1979 , VDI-GESELLSCHAFT KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK , DüSSELDORF Aufbereitung von Thermoplastischen Abfällen in der Schmelze |