EP0536755 - Photographic printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Tsutomu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 2-26-30 Nishi-Azabu Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92117215.1 | 08.10.1992 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | JP19910290986 | 09.10.1991 Original published format: JP 29098691 | JP19910332153 | 16.12.1991 Original published format: JP 33215391 | [1993/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0536755 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0536755 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536755 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/387 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/3875 (EP,US);
G03B27/32 (EP,US);
G03B27/735 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/15] | Title | German: | Fotografisches Kopiergerät | [1993/15] | English: | Photographic printer | [1993/15] | French: | Imprimante photographique | [1993/15] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4482924 (BROWNSTEIN SCOTT A [US]); | [X]EP0202931 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [X]WO9004302 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US4958233 (OKINO YOSHIHARU [JP]); | [X]EP0410376 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK [JP]) |