EP0537661 - Tie- or luggage tag for separate inscriptions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fix Concept GmbH Horstring 12 76829 Landau/Pfalz / DE | [1996/37] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states Fix GmbH Horstring 12 D-76829 Landau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diemert, Kurt Kronstrasse 29 W-6741 Gleisweiler / DE | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 20 80 76810 Landau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. F.W. Möll Dipl.-Ing. H.Ch. Bitterich Postfach 20 80 D-76810 Landau / DE | Application number, filing date | 92117401.7 | 12.10.1992 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | DE19914134231 | 16.10.1991 Original published format: DE 4134231 | [1993/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537661 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537661 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10, G09F3/02 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
G09F3/0288 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1495 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | Gepäckstreifenanhänger für Einzelbeschriftung | [1993/16] | English: | Tie- or luggage tag for separate inscriptions | [1993/16] | French: | Etiquette de bagage en forme de bandes pour inscriptions séparées | [1993/16] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 04.03.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.12.1996 | ES | 11.12.1996 | FR | 11.12.1996 | GB | 11.12.1996 | IT | 11.12.1996 | NL | 11.12.1996 | SE | 11.03.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
ES | 11.12.1996 | ||
FR | 11.12.1996 | ||
GB | 11.12.1996 | ||
IT | 11.12.1996 | ||
NL | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [2003/07] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
ES | 11.12.1996 | ||
GB | 11.12.1996 | ||
IT | 11.12.1996 | ||
NL | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
FR | 09.05.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
ES | 11.12.1996 | ||
GB | 11.12.1996 | ||
IT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
FR | 09.05.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
GB | 11.12.1996 | ||
IT | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
FR | 09.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 11.12.1996 | |
DK | 11.12.1996 | ||
GB | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
FR | 09.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | BE | 11.12.1996 | |
GB | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
FR | 09.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | BE | 11.12.1996 | |
GB | 11.12.1996 | ||
FR | 09.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | BE | 11.12.1996 | |
GB | 11.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/40] | BE | 11.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2151205 (NORCROS INVESTMENTS LTD); | [A]US4817310 (BREEN THOMAS J [US], et al); | [A]WO8908907 (GOETTEL HEINZ KOMET DRUCK [DE]); | [AD]DE8911858U ; | [AD]DE9110080U |