EP0547330 - Method for manufacturing product made of fiber-reinforced resin and product manufactured by method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1998 [1998/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 1-1 Tsutsui-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED 1-1 Tsutsuicho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Kazumi 4-18, Higuredoori 6-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Tetsuo 3-4, Ishizai-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/25] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92117817.4 | 19.10.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | JP19910271566 | 19.10.1991 Original published format: JP 27156691 | JP19910271570 | 19.10.1991 Original published format: JP 27157091 | JP19920237027 | 04.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23702792 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0547330 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0547330 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0547330 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/02, B29C53/80, B29B15/12 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
B29C53/566 (EP);
B29B11/16 (EP);
B29C53/083 (EP);
B29C53/585 (EP);
B29C53/824 (EP);
B29C70/48 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | B29C67/14, B29C53/80, B29B15/12 | ||
Former IPC [1993/25] | B29C67/14, B29C53/80 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem Gegenstand aus mit Fasern verstärktem Harz und so hergestelltem Gegenstand | [1993/25] | English: | Method for manufacturing product made of fiber-reinforced resin and product manufactured by method | [1993/25] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un objet en résine renforcée par des fibres et objet obtenu | [1993/25] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3975479 [ ] (MCCLEAN WILLIAM GEORGE); | DE2937377 [ ] (VER FOERDERUNG INST KUNSTSTOFF); | US4746386 [ ] (SATO SHIGERU [JP], et al); | GB2208364 [ ] (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | GB2212436 [ ] (DIVERSIFIED PROD [US]) | Examination | EP0338115 | EP0444819 |