EP0593799 - Method of and device for shaping a blank of sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZEPPELIN-Metallwerke GmbH Postfach 25 40 D-88015 Friedrichshafen / DE | [1994/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sieger, Erich Ellenbergweg 4 W-7990 Friedrichshafen 5 / DE | [1994/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92117831.5 | 19.10.1992 | [1994/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593799 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0593799 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/18 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
B21D22/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1994/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verformen eines Blechrohlings | [1994/17] | English: | Method of and device for shaping a blank of sheet | [1994/17] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour façonner un flan en tôle | [1994/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/51] | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3815395 (SASS J); | [A]EP0457358 (ZEPPELIN METALLWERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE1527973 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US3342051 (EDWARD LESZAK) | by applicant | US3815395 |