EP0545055 - Process for producing shaped articles by starting from reinforced thermoplastic sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTELL ITALIA S.p.A. Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | [1997/16] |
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states MONTELL ITALIA S.p.A. Via Rosellini 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states CENTRO SVILUPPO SETTORI IMPIEGO S.r.l. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Addeo, Antonio, Dr. 8, Via Cerruti I-28100 Novara / IT | 02 /
Vitali, Mario, Eng. 12, Via Pancrazi I-20100 Milan / IT | 03 /
Bonari, Roberto 12, Via V. Veneto I-20023 Cerro Maggiore, Milan / IT | [2000/22] |
Former [1993/23] | 01 /
Addeo, Antonio, Dr. 8, Via Cerruti I-28100 Novara / IT | ||
02 /
Vitali, Mario, Eng. 12, Via Pancrazi I-20100 Milan / IT | |||
03 /
Bonari, Roberto, Mr. 12, Via V. Veneto I-20023 Cerro Maggiore, Milan / IT | Representative(s) | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio, et al Basell Poliolefine Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Gaverini, Gaetano, et al Montell Italia S.p.A. Intellectual Property, Patents and Trademarks Via Pergolesi 25 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/23] | Zanoli, Enrico Spherilene S.p.A. Via Taramelli 26/28 I-20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92118013.9 | 26.10.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI02854 | 28.10.1991 Original published format: IT MI912854 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545055 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545055 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/14, B29C51/10, B29C49/00 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B29C51/10 (EP,US);
B29C49/0691 (EP,US);
B29D22/00 (EP,US);
B29C49/06916 (EP,US);
B29C49/22 (EP,US);
B29C51/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/04] |
Former [1993/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung geformter Erzeugnisse aus verstärkten thermoplastischen Folien | [1993/23] | English: | Process for producing shaped articles by starting from reinforced thermoplastic sheets | [1993/23] | French: | Procédé pour le formage d'objets à partir de feuilles thermoplastiques renforcées | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1993 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 21.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 31.05.1996 | Appeal received No. T0771/96 | 12.07.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.09.1997 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1997/40] | 26.01.1998 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1998/05] | 24.07.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB903986 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS); | [X]FR2414992 (IRBIT HOLDING AG [CH]); | [X]GB2088281 (GOODYEAR AEROSPACE CORP); | [X]FR2627127 (HP CHEMIE PELZER RESEARCH DEVE [IE]) |