EP0550804 - Device for removing calculus from human body cavities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winkler, Klaus, Dr. Edinghäuser Strasse 16 D-49076 Osnabrück / DE | [1993/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118142.6 | 23.10.1992 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | DE19924200258 | 08.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4200258 | [1993/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550804 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550804 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
A61B17/22032 (EP,US);
A61B17/22 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22051 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Steinen aus menschlichen Körperhöhlen | [1993/28] | English: | Device for removing calculus from human body cavities | [1993/28] | French: | Dispositif pour l'enlèvement des calculs des cavités du corps humain | [1993/28] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.02.1995 | ES | 08.02.1995 | IT | 08.02.1995 | PT | 08.05.1995 | SE | 08.05.1995 | AT | 23.10.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 08.02.1995 | |
IT | 08.02.1995 | ||
PT | 08.05.1995 | ||
SE | 08.05.1995 | ||
AT | 23.10.1995 | ||
Former [1997/16] | BE | 08.02.1995 | |
PT | 08.05.1995 | ||
SE | 08.05.1995 | ||
AT | 23.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 08.02.1995 | |
PT | 08.05.1995 | ||
SE | 08.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0200668 (FOGARTY THOMAS J [US]); | [YD]DE3616205 (LEUSCHNER ULRICH [DE]); | [A]WO8809683 (KLETSCHKA HAROLD D [US]); | [A]EP0465051 (VANCE PRODUCTS INC [US]) | Examination | US4997435 |