EP0538904 - Carboxyalkyl polysaccharides and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ning, Xin 2641 West Eighth Street Appleton, Wisconsin 54914 / US | 02 /
Sun, Tong 1747 Golf Bridge Drive, Apt. 8 Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118266.3 | 26.10.1992 | [1993/17] | Priority number, date | US19910782853 | 25.10.1991 Original published format: US 782853 | US19910808086 | 11.12.1991 Original published format: US 808086 | [1993/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0538904 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0538904 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0538904 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0538904 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C08B11/20, C08B15/10, // A61L15/00 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
A61L15/60 (EP);
C08B11/12 (EP);
C08B11/20 (EP);
C08B15/005 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/60, C08L1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/17] | Title | German: | Carboxyalkylpolysaccharide und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1993/17] | English: | Carboxyalkyl polysaccharides and process for their preparation | [1993/17] | French: | Carboxyalkylpolysaccharides et procédé pour les préparer | [1993/17] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 29.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.1998
07.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE SCA Research AB 40503 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | 02
17.09.1998
07.10.1998
ADMISSIBLE Hercules Incorporated Hercules Plaza, 1313 North Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19894-0001 / US Opponent's representative Kindler, Matthias, et al, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.1998
SCA Research AB 40503 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | ||
02
17.09.1998
Hercules Incorporated Hercules Plaza, 1313 North Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19894-0001 / US Opponent's representative Kindler, Matthias, et al, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | 29.10.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.07.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.12.2000 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.12.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.08.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1086323 ; | [Y]FR2510628 ; | [Y]US3858585 ; | [A]US4200736 ; | [AD]US3723413 | Opposition | US3731686 | EP0201895 | EP0566118 | GB1397154 | WO9010495 | US4090013 | DD212969 | - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, Weinheim, Germany, 1986, p. 477-479 |