EP0544108 - Semi-active suspension control system for cars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/22] | Semi-active undercarriage control system | ||
[1996/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20 D-60441 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckert, Alfred Burgunderweg 12 W-6500 Mainz-Laubenheim / DE | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/44] |
Former [1993/22] | Blum, Klaus-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. c/o ALFRED TEVES GMBH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118270.5 | 26.10.1992 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | DE19914138932 | 27.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4138932 | [1993/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544108 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544108 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/08, B60G17/015 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
B60G17/018 (EP);
B60G2400/10 (EP);
B60G2400/20 (EP);
B60G2400/25 (EP);
B60G2400/60 (EP);
B60G2400/82 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/22] | Title | German: | Semiaktives Fahrwerksregelungssystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1996/27] | English: | Semi-active suspension control system for cars | [1996/27] | French: | Système de commande d'une suspension semi-actif pour véhicules automobiles | [1996/27] |
Former [1993/22] | Semiaktives Fahrwerksregelungssystem | ||
Former [1993/22] | Semi-active undercarriage control system | ||
Former [1993/22] | Système de réglage semi-actif pour mécanisme de roulement | Examination procedure | 26.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 14.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.07.1996 | ES | 14.10.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/03] | IT | 03.07.1996 | |
ES | 14.10.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 03.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5016908 (ATHANAS DAVID S [US], et al); | [A]US5024460 (HANSON REED D [US], et al); | [A]US5000478 (KERASTAS MICHAEL W [US]); | [A]US4976454 (BOHN GERHARD [DE]); | [AD]DE3939668 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [AD]DE3916460 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | Examination | EP0557322 | WO9208623 |