EP0542064 - Vehicle wheel speed sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/20] | Vehicle wheel speed sensor employing a locating plate | ||
[1996/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caron, Laverne Andrew 2550 Cutty Sark Drive Kalamazoo, Michigan 49009 / US | 02 /
Kendzior, James Michael 2416 Russett Drive Kalamazoo, Michigan 49008 / US | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | Barthelt, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Barthelt, Hans-Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 D-73704 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118657.3 | 31.10.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | US19910789712 | 08.11.1991 Original published format: US 789712 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542064 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0542064 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/488 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
B60B7/002 (EP,US);
G01P3/42 (KR);
G01P3/488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/20] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugradgeschwindigkeitsaufnehmer | [1996/34] | English: | Vehicle wheel speed sensor | [1996/34] | French: | Capteur de vitesse d'une roue de véhicule | [1996/34] |
Former [1993/20] | Fahrzeugradgeschwindigkeitsaufnehmer und Befestigungsanordnung dafür | ||
Former [1993/20] | Vehicle wheel speed sensor employing a locating plate | ||
Former [1993/20] | Capteur de vitesse d'une roue de véhicule et dispositif de montage pour celui-ci | Examination procedure | 17.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 03.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3887046 (BUELER RICHARD C); | [X]US3910386 (STIGALL DONALD R, et al); | [A]US3916234 (STIGALL DONALD R, et al) |