EP0543222 - Method for detecting nucleic acids and relative diagnostic kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA BIOTECH SpA Via Castagnetta, 7 00040 Pomezia (Roma) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states ALFA BIOTECH S.p.A. Via Castagnetta, 7 I-00040 Pomezia (Roma) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curcio, Stefano Via Castagnetta, 7 I-00040 Pomezia, Roma / IT | 02 /
Cellentani, Gabriella Via Castagnetta, 7 I-00040 Pomezia, Roma / IT | 03 /
Fochesato, Natalia Via Castagnetta, 7 I-00040 Pomezia, Roma / IT | 04 /
Padula, Cristiano Via Castagnetta, 7 I-00040 Pomezia, Roma / IT | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | Minoja, Fabrizio Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92118867.8 | 04.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI03048 | 15.11.1991 Original published format: IT MI913048 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0543222 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
C12Q1/701 (EP);
C12Q1/6804 (EP);
C12Q1/686 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2565/537, C12Q2549/119 (EP);
C12Q1/686, C12Q2565/537, C12Q2549/119 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren für den Nachweis von Nukleinsäuren und Testsatz dafür | [1993/21] | English: | Method for detecting nucleic acids and relative diagnostic kit | [1993/21] | French: | Procédé de détection d'acides nucléiques et kit | [1993/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 11.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/24] | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2202328 (ORION YHTYMAE OY); | [Y]EP0357011 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [A]WO9011369 (HOLMES MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al) | [YD] - ANNALES DE BIOLOGIE CLINIQUE vol. 47, 1989, pages 601 - 606 I. NUR ET AL. 'Chemiprobe, a nonradioactive system for labeling nucleic acid' |