EP0545094 - Piston ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Burscheid GmbH Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17 51399 Burscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states AE GOETZE GmbH Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17 D-51399 Burscheid / DE | ||
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states GOETZE AG Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17 D-51399 Burscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mader, Heinrich-Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Füllsichel 33 W-5093 Burscheid / DE | 02 /
Mierbach, Albin, Dipl.-Phys. Burscheider Strasse 308 W-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | 03 /
Schmelter, Wolfgang Sperberweg 17 W-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1993/23] | Application number, filing date | 92118960.1 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | DE19914140232 | 06.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140232 | [1993/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545094 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545094 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16J9/12 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
F16J9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1995/23] |
Former [1993/23] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Kolbenring | [1993/23] | English: | Piston ring | [1993/23] | French: | Segment de piston | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 01.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SCHMID E. 'handbuch der dichtungstechnik' 1981 , EXPERT VERLAG , GRAFENAU |