EP0541105 - Recirculation and plug flow combustion method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [1995/01] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ho, Min-Da 123 Michtell Road Somers (10589) / US | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92118997.3 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | US19910788603 | 06.11.1991 Original published format: US 788603 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0541105 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0541105 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541105 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F23C9/00, F23G5/08, F23L7/00 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
F23C9/006 (EP,KR,US);
F23G5/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1998/02] |
Former [1993/19] | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT | Title | German: | Verbrennungsverfahren mit Rückführung und Pfropfenströmung | [1998/21] | English: | Recirculation and plug flow combustion method | [1993/19] | French: | Procédé de combustion avec recirculation et écoulement en bouchon | [1998/21] |
Former [1993/19] | Verbrennungsverfahren mit Rückführungs- und idealer Strömungszone | ||
Former [1993/19] | Procédé de combustion avec zone de recirculation et zone d'écoulement idéal | Examination procedure | 07.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 08.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5000102 (HO MIN-DA [US]); | [A]GB2067729 (PENBERTHY HARVEY LARRY); | [AD]US4863371 (HO MIN-DA [US]); | [A]WO8601131 (AMERICAN COMBUSTION INC [US]); | [A]EP0451648 (UNION CARBIDE IND GASES TECH [US]); | [A]US4957050 (HO MIN-DA [US]) |