EP0541111 - Method of forming solder mask [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2, Oyodo-kita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2, Oyodo-kita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagami, Yoshikazu 51-3, Kunimatsu-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Kashihara, Akio 3-24-12, Yamanoue Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Seio, Mamoru 1-7-3-405, Tsukahara Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Tanabe, Hisaki 7-9, Musashishiba, Yawata Yawata-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119038.5 | 06.11.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | JP19910289839 | 06.11.1991 Original published format: JP 28983991 | JP19920100956 | 21.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10095692 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541111 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0541111 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, G03F7/038, G03F7/027 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
G03F7/038 (EP);
G03F7/00 (KR);
G03F7/164 (EP);
H05K3/28 (EP);
H05K2203/1105 (EP);
H05K2203/1355 (EP);
H05K3/0079 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Lötstopmaske | [1993/19] | English: | Method of forming solder mask | [1993/19] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un masque pour soudage | [1993/19] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/12: (deleted) | EPB 1997/12: (deleted) | EPB 1997/12: (deleted) | EPB 1996/17: Teilanmeldung 96100048.6 eingereicht am 03/01/96 | EPB 1996/17: Divisional application 96100048.6 filed on 03/01/96 | EPB 1996/17: Demande divisionnaire 96100048.6 déposée le 03/01/96 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96100048.6 / EP0711105 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.03.1997 | NL | 19.03.1997 | GB | 06.11.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 19.03.1997 | |
FR | 14.08.1997 | ||
GB | 06.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | FR | 14.08.1997 | |
GB | 06.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | FR | 14.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4894317 (MARUYAMA TSUTOMU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0286594 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]WO9103770 (COATES BROTHERS PLC [GB]) |