EP0538905 - Equipment for the actuation of needles for the realization of electric motors field windings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIS S.p.A. 50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa (Firenze) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states AXIS S.p.A. I-50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa (Firenze) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luciano, Sabatino Via di Querceto 169 I-50100 Firenze / IT | 02 /
Lumini, Antonio Via G.Leopardi 9 I-50019 Sesto Fiorentino(Firenze) / IT | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Lotti, Giorgio c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 92119069.0 | 08.03.1988 | [1993/17] | Priority number, date | IT19870068009 | 26.11.1987 Original published format: IT 6800987 | [1993/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0538905 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0538905 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/095 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
H02K15/095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1993/17] | Title | German: | Betätigungsgerät für Legenadeln zur Herstellung von Feldwicklungen elektrischer Motoren | [1993/17] | English: | Equipment for the actuation of needles for the realization of electric motors field windings | [1993/17] | French: | Dispositif de mise en action des tubes de guidage pour la fabrication de bobinages de champ pour moteurs électriques | [1993/17] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 20.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88200431.0 / EP0318063 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3025008 (NILL RICHARD G, et al); | [AD]US3903593 (MASON LOWELL M); | [A]EP0209624 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) |