EP0541118 - Controller for data transfer between a digital telephone network and a processor controlled terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1998 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sedlbauer Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelm-Sedlbauer-Str. 2 D-94481 Grafenau / DE | [1993/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klee, Volkmar, Dr. Rebhuhnbogen 8 W-8352 Grafenau / DE | 02 /
Steiner, Hans Wittelsbacherstrasse 8 W-8352 Grafenau / DE | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Preissner, Nicolaus Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Michelis & Preissner, Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Seibert, Hannelore, et al Seibert Michelis Preissner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119078.1 | 06.11.1992 | [1993/19] | Priority number, date | DE19914136546 | 06.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4136546 | [1993/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541118 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04M11/00 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
H04M1/6505 (EP);
H04L9/40 (EP);
H04Q11/0471 (EP);
H04Q2213/003 (EP);
H04Q2213/036 (EP);
H04Q2213/093 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für die Datenübermittlung zwischen einem digitalen Fernsprechnetz und einem prozessorbestückten Endgerät | [1993/19] | English: | Controller for data transfer between a digital telephone network and a processor controlled terminal | [1993/19] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour le transfert de données entre un réseau téléphonique numérique et un terminal à commande par processeur | [1993/19] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/51] | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE9006238U ; | [Y]EP0451523 (TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH [DE]); | [XP]DE4042232 (INTEC GES FUER INFORMATIONSTEC [DE]) | [Y] - NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT vol. 32, no. 2, April 1991, TOKYO JP pages 262 - 269 C.UENO ET AL. | [Y] - COMMUTATION ET TRANSMISSION vol. 11, no. 1, 1989, PARIS FR pages 67 - 82 S.ALEXANIAN ET AL. | [A] - ELEKTRONIK vol. 38, no. 22, 27 October 1989, MUNCHEN DE pages 60 - 67 R.SCHMIDBERGER | [A] - IRE WESCON CONFERENCE RECORD, SESSION 10, PAPER 1, 18 November 1986, NORTH HOLLYWOOD US pages 1 - 7 G. GEIGER ET AL. |