EP0543244 - Fluoro substituted tolans and liquid crystal mixtures containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1993/21] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchecker, Richard Felsenstrasse 10 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Schadt, Martin Liestalerstrasse 77 CH-4411 Seltisberg / CH | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1996/31] |
Former [1993/21] | Cottong, Norbert A., et al Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 92119127.6 | 09.11.1992 | [1993/21] | Priority number, date | CH19910003375 | 19.11.1991 Original published format: CH 337591 | CH19920001918 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: CH 191892 | [1993/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0543244 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0543244 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C25/24, C09K19/18, C09K19/34, C09K19/30, C07C43/225, C07C255/50, C07D213/26, C07D239/26, C07D319/06, G02F1/13 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07C25/24 (EP,US);
C07C255/50 (EP,US);
C07C43/1747 (EP,US);
C07C43/176 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07D213/26 (EP,US);
C07D213/63 (EP,US);
C07D239/26 (EP,US);
C07D319/06 (EP,US);
C09K19/18 (EP,US);
C09K19/3059 (EP,US);
C09K19/3066 (EP,US);
C09K19/3402 (EP,US);
C09K19/3444 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1993/21] | Title | German: | Fluorsubstituierte Tolane und sie enthaltende flüssigkristalline Gemische | [1993/21] | English: | Fluoro substituted tolans and liquid crystal mixtures containing them | [1993/21] | French: | Tolanes fluoro substitués et mélanges de cristaux liquides les contenant | [1993/21] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.08.1997 | IT | 20.08.1997 | NL | 20.08.1997 | CH | 30.11.1997 | LI | 30.11.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 20.08.1997 | |
IT | 20.08.1997 | ||
NL | 20.08.1997 | ||
CH | 30.11.1997 | ||
LI | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2003/07] | IT | 20.08.1997 | |
NL | 20.08.1997 | ||
CH | 30.11.1997 | ||
LI | 30.11.1997 | ||
FR | 16.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 20.08.1997 | |
CH | 30.11.1997 | ||
LI | 30.11.1997 | ||
FR | 16.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/50] | CH | 30.11.1997 | |
LI | 30.11.1997 | ||
FR | 16.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | FR | 16.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8807514 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [XP]DE4105742 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) | [YP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Columbus, Ohio, US; | Examination | JP03206055 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Columbus, Ohio, US; vol. 116, no. 72519n & JP-A-03 206 055, & JP03206055 A 00000000 |