EP0542176 - Magneto-optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brekner, Michael-Joachim, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Geisenheimer Strasse 90 W-6000 Frankfurt 71 / DE | 02 /
Hellstern, Egon, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Feldbergstrasse 12 W-6273 Waldems-Niederems / DE | 03 /
Weber, Christoph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Joinviller Strasse 24 W-6072 Dreieich / DE | [1993/20] | Application number, filing date | 92119156.5 | 09.11.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | DE19914137427 | 14.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4137427 | [1993/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0542176 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0542176 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0542176 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
G11B7/253 (EP,US);
G11B11/10582 (EP,US);
G11B11/10584 (EP,US);
G11B5/7368 (EP,US);
G11B5/73923 (EP,US);
G11B5/73925 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/20] | Title | German: | Magnetooptisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1993/20] | English: | Magneto-optical recording medium | [1993/20] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement magnéto-optique | [1993/20] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 22.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0454079 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]EP0407870 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0156464 |