EP0542185 - Multilayered plastic pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-45764 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mügge, Joachim, Dr. Kantstrasse 14 W-4358 Haltern / DE | 02 /
Röber, Stefan, Dr. Max-Reger-Strasse 138 W-4370 Marl / DE | [1993/20] | Application number, filing date | 92119182.1 | 10.11.1992 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | DE19914137430 | 14.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4137430 | [1993/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542185 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0542185 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/34, B32B27/36, B32B1/08, F16L11/04, F16L9/12 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B1/08 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
F16L11/04 (EP,US);
F16L9/12 (EP,US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2597/00 (US);
B32B2605/08 (US);
F16L2011/047 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/20] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiges Kunststoffrohr | [1993/20] | English: | Multilayered plastic pipe | [1993/20] | French: | Tuyau multicouche en plastique | [1993/20] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 30.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 29.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP4224384 ; | [A]US3561493 (MAILLARD PAUL, et al); | [A]WO8702680 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0325030 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [XP]EP0509212 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) | [AP] - DATABASE WPIL Week 3992, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 92-320031 & JP-A-4 224 384 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) 13. August 1992, & JP4224384 A 00000000 | Examination | DE3510395 | DE3827092 |