EP0551582 - Pipe coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRAUB FEDERNFABRIK AG Straubstrasse CH-7323 Wangs / CH | [1993/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Straub, Immanuel Haus Garzil, Melserstrasse CH-7323 Wangs / CH | [1993/29] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 92119420.5 | 13.11.1992 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | CH19920000115 | 16.01.1992 Original published format: CH 11592 | [1993/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551582 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551582 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L17/04 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
F16L21/005 (EP,US);
F16L17/04 (EP,US);
F16L21/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1993/29] | Title | German: | Rohrkupplung | [1993/29] | English: | Pipe coupling | [1993/29] | French: | Raccord pour tuyaux | [1993/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3116078 (SCHERER BERNARD F); | [AD]US4119333 (STRAUB IMMANUEL); | [A]EP0211158 (STRAUB IMMANUEL); | [A]EP0205896 |