EP0564703 - Macromers of vinylidene fluoride arylate-terminated poly(vinylidene fluoride) and its copolymeric thermoplastic elastomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | For all designated states THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicholas, Paul Peter 4775 Canterbury Lane Broadview Heights, Ohio 44147 / US | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119526.9 | 14.11.1992 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | US19920864753 | 07.04.1992 Original published format: US 864753 | [1993/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564703 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0564703 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F299/00, C08F8/00, C08F8/14 | [1993/41] | CPC: |
C08F290/04 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F14/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/41] | Title | German: | Makromere von Polyvinylidenfluorid mit Acrylatendgruppen und ihre thermoplastischen Elastomercopolymere | [1993/41] | English: | Macromers of vinylidene fluoride arylate-terminated poly(vinylidene fluoride) and its copolymeric thermoplastic elastomers | [1993/41] | French: | Macromères de polyfluorure de vinylidène comprenant des groupes acrylates terminaux et leurs elastomères copolymériques thermoplastiques | [1993/41] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.1996 | CH | 22.05.1996 | DK | 22.05.1996 | GR | 22.05.1996 | LI | 22.05.1996 | NL | 22.05.1996 | PT | 22.08.1996 | SE | 22.08.1996 | IE | 14.11.1996 | LU | 30.11.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2001/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
IE | 14.11.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
GR | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
DK | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
PT | 22.08.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
CH | 22.05.1996 | ||
LI | 22.05.1996 | ||
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 22.05.1996 | |
SE | 22.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 22.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0030115 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0178618 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) |