EP0550819 - Glass ceramic article decorated with coloured ceramic paint, in particular glass ceramic sheet and method to remove vague contours from glass ceramic articles decorated with coloured ceramic paint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
IT
LI
SE
AT
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For:CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
IT
LI
SE
AT
Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
Carl-Zeiss-Stiftung trading as SCHOTT GLASWERKE Hattenbergstrasse 10 D-55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leroux, Roland, Dr. Spielbergstrasse 49a W-6501 Stadecken-Elsheim 2 / DE | 02 /
Rodek, Erich, Dr. Katzenberg 67 W-6500 Mainz 21 / DE | 03 /
Schaupert, Kurt, Dr. Rüdesheimerstrasse 46 W-6238 Hofheim-Wallau / DE | 04 /
Thürk, Jürgen, Dr. Höllenwegstrasse 2 W-6509 Schornsheim / DE | 05 /
Weinberg, Waldemar, Dr. Zum Eichwald 31 W-6531 Seibersbach / DE | [1993/28] | Application number, filing date | 92119658.0 | 19.11.1992 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | DE19924200449 | 10.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4200449 | [1993/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550819 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550819 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/34 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
C03C17/3411 (EP,US);
C03C17/25 (KR);
Y10T428/24926 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | Mit Keramikfarbe dekorierter Artikel aus Glaskeramik, insbesondere Glaskeramikscheibe sowie Verfahren zum Entfernen der Haloisierung bei mit Keramikfarbe dekorierten Glaskeramikartikeln | [1993/28] | English: | Glass ceramic article decorated with coloured ceramic paint, in particular glass ceramic sheet and method to remove vague contours from glass ceramic articles decorated with coloured ceramic paint | [1993/28] | French: | Article vitro céramique décoré avec une composition colorante céramique, en particulier une feuille vitro céramique, et procédé d'élimination des contours vagues d'articles vitro céramiques décorés avec une composition colorante céramique | [1993/28] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 26.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55167191 ; | [A]DE1912938 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG); | [A]US4264679 (PANZARINO JOSEPH N, et al); | [YD]DE3936654 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, 1977, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 121771g, Seite 261 ; | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Week 10, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 81-16332D & JP-A-55 167 191 (NIPPON SHASHIN INSA) 27. Dezember 1980, & JP55167191 A 00000000 | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, 1977, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 121771g,Seite 261 ; & VITREOUS ENAMELLER Bd. 27, Nr. 1, 1976, ENGLAND Seiten 19-23 R.L. STEVENS ET AL. 'SURFACE TREATMENT FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF VITREOUS ENAMEL COATINGS' |