EP0544197 - Hot water heating installation for building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURATHERM HANDELS GmbH Kesselbodenstrasse 14 D-85391 Allershausen / DE | [1993/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rabien, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Tassilostrasse 24 W-8500 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
von Spaun, Heinrich Hermann-Rainer-Strasse 5 W-8036 Herrsching / DE | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | Staeger, Sigurd, et al Müllerstrasse 31 D-80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | Staeger, Sigurd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Müllerstrasse 31 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119827.1 | 20.11.1992 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | DE19914139181 | 28.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4139181 | [1993/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544197 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24D11/00, F24D19/10 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
F24D19/1066 (EP,US);
F24D11/002 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/22] | Title | German: | Warmwasserheizungsanlage für Gebäude | [1993/22] | English: | Hot water heating installation for building | [1993/22] | French: | Installation de chauffage à eau chaude pour bâtiments | [1993/22] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/16] | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2001862 (THYSSEN IND GMBH AG); | [A]DE2341566 (WITTE HAUSTECHNIK GMBH); | [X]DE3312479 (NOVA APPARATEBAU GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]DE3624864 (ATZENHOFER WERNER) |