EP0548564 - Storage device employing a flash memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | ||
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagami, Hajime 309 Hitachi-Totsukaryo, 1745, Totsukacho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Terada, Kouichi 105, Hitachi-Cecilia-Nagatadai, 9-3, Nagatadai Minami-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Yoshihiro 201, Hitachi-Shumeiryo, 248-1, Hongo Mimomicho, Narashino-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Tsunehiro, Takashi 2317-4, Kadosawabashi Ebina-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Katayama, Kunihiro 413, Hitachi-Fujimiryo, 1545, Yoshidacho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Kaki, Kenichi 245, Hitachi-Mitakeryo, 1545, Yoshidacho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Furuno, Takeshi 1-17-2-403, Gakuennishimachi Kodaira-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/26] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119968.3 | 24.11.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910310848 | 26.11.1991 Original published format: JP 31084891 | JP19910314297 | 28.11.1991 Original published format: JP 31429791 | JP19920031756 | 19.02.1992 Original published format: JP 3175692 | JP19920099891 | 20.04.1992 Original published format: JP 9989192 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0548564 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0548564 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548564 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
G11C29/765 (EP,US);
G11C11/34 (KR);
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G06F3/0616 (EP,US);
G06F3/0659 (EP,US);
G06F3/0679 (EP,US);
G11C16/06 (KR);
G11C16/102 (EP,US);
G06F2212/2022 (EP,US);
G06F3/0664 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/26] | Title | German: | Einen Flashspeicher verwendendes Speichergerät | [1993/26] | English: | Storage device employing a flash memory | [1993/26] | French: | Dispositif d'emmagasinage utilisant une mémoire flash | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3200872 (SARTORIUS GMBH [DE]); | [XP]GB2251324 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [E]EP0522780 (IBM [US]); | [X]EP0392895 (SUNDISK CORP [US]) |