EP0544222 - Casing, in particular for small electric machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FHP Motors GmbH Klingenbergplatz 1 26133 Oldenburg / DE | [1997/13] |
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Am Schilf 17 W-2900 Oldenburg / DE | 02 /
Tillner, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Weissenmoorstrasse 208a W-2900 Oldenburg / DE | 03 /
Oltmanns, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Kiesgrubenstrasse 28 W-2900 Oldenburg / DE | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | Zangs, Rainer E., et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Zangs, Rainer E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/22] | Vogl, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-G.m.b.H. Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92119976.6 | 24.11.1992 | [1993/22] | Priority number, date | DE19914138705 | 26.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4138705 | [1993/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544222 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544222 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/04, H02K5/15 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
H02K5/04 (EP);
H02K5/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1993/22] | Title | German: | Gehäuse, insbesondere für elektrische Kleinmaschinen | [1993/22] | English: | Casing, in particular for small electric machine | [1993/22] | French: | Carcasse, en particulier pour petites machines électriques | [1993/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 23.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.04.1997 | IT | 23.04.1997 | SE | 23.07.1997 | CH | 30.11.1997 | LI | 30.11.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.04.1997 | |
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.11.1997 | ||
LI | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/50] | SE | 23.07.1997 | |
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
CH | 30.11.1997 | ||
LI | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 23.07.1997 | |
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | FR | 19.09.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1613262 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [Y]US3487457 (DROUARD JEAN L, et al); | [Y]FR2287800 (SCHULTE ELEKTROTECH [DE]); | [Y]GB1236328 (CONTROLS CO OF AMERICA [US]) | Examination | US4499391 | US3732616 |