EP0545237 - Inking unit for a printing machine, especially an offset printing machine for sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanzler, Stephan Frankfurterstrasse 92 W-6054 Rodgau 3 / DE | 02 /
Herbert, Willi Hanauerstrasse 12 W-6050 Offenbach/Main / DE | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Marek, Joachim, et al c/o MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Marek, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung/FTB S, Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120031.7 | 25.11.1992 | [1993/23] | Priority number, date | DE19914140048 | 05.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140048 | [1993/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0545237 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0545237 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/14 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
B41F31/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/23] | Title | German: | Farbwerk für eine Druckmaschine, insbesondere Bogenoffsetdruckmaschine | [1993/23] | English: | Inking unit for a printing machine, especially an offset printing machine for sheets | [1993/23] | French: | Unité d'encrage pour une machine d'impression, particulièrement machine d'impression offset pour feuilles | [1993/23] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3013489 (MOSER HENRY W, et al); | [AD]EP0000329 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]); | [AD]DE2854032 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [AD]DE3424721 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]); | [A]US4869167 (VILLARREAL JOSE A [US]); | [A]EP0418778 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0518034 |