EP0555536 - Submersible lamp for photochemical reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Noblelight GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states Heraeus Noblelight GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1993/33] | For all designated states Heraeus Instruments GmbH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ullrich, Bernt Brüder-Grimm-Strasse 3 W-6455 Erlensee / DE | [1993/33] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120051.5 | 25.11.1992 | [1993/33] | Priority number, date | DE19924203840 | 10.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4203840 | [1993/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555536 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0555536 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/50, F21V19/02, B01J19/12 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B01J19/123 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/33] | H01J5/50, F21V19/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/33] | Title | German: | Tauchlampe für einen photochemischen Reaktor | [1993/33] | English: | Submersible lamp for photochemical reactor | [1993/33] | French: | Lampe submersible pour un réacteur photochimique | [1993/33] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1020934 (NATURAL LIGHTING CORP, et al); | [A]GB2107110 (EMI PLC THORN [GB]); | [A]EP0466584 (PERCHE ETS [FR]) |