EP0546398 - A process for preparing polyamines for lighter color polyisocyanate based foam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION One Mellon Center 500 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation One Mellon Center 500 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | ||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states MILES INC. One Mellon Center 500 Grant St. Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | ||
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation One Mellon Center 500 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | ||
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states MILES INC. One Mellon Center 500 Grant St. Pittsburgh, PA 15219-2502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolton, Jeffrey S. R.D. No. 3,Box 183-B Wheeling, WV 26003 / US | 02 /
Kalyanaraman, Ramon 5 Greentree Road Wheeling, WV 26003 / US | 03 /
Schilling, Steven L. 4 Michelle Ct., Darwood Estate Glen Dale, WV 26038 / US | 04 /
Blue, Clarence D. Gneisenaustrasse 20 W-4047 Dormagen 1 / DE | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gerhard, et al Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Müller, Gerhard, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernzentrale RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1993/24] | Müller, Gerhard, Dr. BAYER AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120304.8 | 27.11.1992 | [1993/24] | Priority number, date | US19910805407 | 10.12.1991 Original published format: US 805407 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0546398 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0546398 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546398 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/32 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
C08G18/7685 (EP,US);
C08G2101/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyaminen für helleren auf Polyisocyanat basierenden Schaum | [1993/24] | English: | A process for preparing polyamines for lighter color polyisocyanate based foam | [1993/24] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polyamines pour des mousses peu colorées à partir de polyisocyanates | [1993/24] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.09.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [1997/34] | FR | 07.02.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2169274 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0283757 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [AD]EP0114970 | Examination | DE2404774 |