EP0548648 - 1:N Ring-type signal protection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/50] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stalick, Victor Joseph 11225 Bull Run Richardson, Texas 75080 / US | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/33] |
Former [2003/40] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/05] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel Alsthom Intellectual Property Department, Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/26] | Pohl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120807.0 | 05.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | US19910806563 | 12.12.1991 Original published format: US 806563 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0548648 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0548648 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548648 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/42, H04Q11/04 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
H04L12/437 (EP,US);
H04J3/14 (EP,US);
H04J2203/006 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0089 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/26] | Title | German: | Ringförmige 1:N Schutzeinrichtung | [1993/26] | English: | 1:N Ring-type signal protection apparatus | [1993/26] | French: | Dispositif de protection en forme d'anneau 1:N | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.02.2004 | SE | 11.05.2004 | [2006/12] |
Former [2004/40] | SE | 11.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0367221 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,7; | [A]EP0206408 (AT & T NETWORK SYSTEMS NL [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,7; | [A]EP0073314 (PHILIPS KOMMUNIKATIONS IND AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,7 |