EP0537799 - Device and structure for supporting floor panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAKA CORPORATION 1-1, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states NAKA CORPORATION 1-1, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naka, Hiromasa, c/o Naka Corporation 1-1, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Okushima, Takehiko, c/o Naka Corporation 1-1, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Okumura, Takao, c/o Naka Corporation 1-1, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shoji, Tatsuo, c/o Naka Corporation 1-1, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tobikawa, Tetsuo, c/o Naka Corporation 1-1, Uchisaiwai-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Spall, Christopher John BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 92120830.2 | 02.05.1990 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890123842 | 17.05.1989 Original published format: JP 12384289 | JP19890123843 | 17.05.1989 Original published format: JP 12384389 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537799 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/024 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
E04F15/02482 (EP,US);
E04F15/02452 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Anordnung zum Tragen von Fussbodenplatten | [1993/16] | English: | Device and structure for supporting floor panels | [1993/16] | French: | Dispositif et structure de support pour panneaux de plancher | [1993/16] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 22.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/19] | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90304767.8 / EP0398547 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2610707 (SHANNON HAROLD S, et al); | [AD]GB1266963 ; | [A]GB1536424 (GODFREY D, et al); | [A]EP0013570 (MARSTETTEN MARBETON [DE]); | [A]US4438610 (FIFER JAMES T [US]); | [A]LU85077 (GLOBAFIN S A [LU]); | [A]US4578910 (GERMEROTH DAVID J [US], et al) |