EP0537800 - Improved electrode structure for capacitance-type measurement transducers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 31-19, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states MITUTOYO CORPORATION 31-19, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andermo, Nils Ingvar 10624 Northeast 37 Circle Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92120856.7 | 30.05.1990 | [1993/16] | Priority number, date | US19890359699 | 31.05.1989 Original published format: US 359699 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537800 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537800 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/24 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
G01D5/2415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Elektrodenstruktur für Messgeber vom Kapazitätstyp | [1993/16] | English: | Improved electrode structure for capacitance-type measurement transducers | [1993/16] | French: | Structure d'électrode perfectionnée pour transducteur du type à mesure capacitive | [1993/16] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/38: Teilanmeldung 95201826.5 eingereicht am 30/05/90 | EPB 1995/38: Divisional application 95201826.5 filed on 30/05/90 | EPB 1995/38: Demande divisionnaire 95201826.5 déposée le 30/05/90 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90110295.4 / EP0400626 | Divisional application(s) | EP95201826.5 / EP0676623 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.07.1998
09.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE Brown & Shape TESA S.A. Rue du Bugnon 38 CH-1020 Renens / CH Opponent's representative BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.07.1998
Brown & Shape TESA S.A. Rue du Bugnon 38 CH-1020 Renens / CH Opponent's representative BOVARD AG Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | 14.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.06.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 07.12.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.05.1993 | 31.05.1997 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   08.08.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 05.02.1998 | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 05.11.1997 | |
LI | 05.11.1997 | ||
SE | 05.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | SE | 05.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2009944 (STIFTELSEN INST MIKROVAGS); | [Y]EP0197462 (XIAN INSTRUMENTATION FACTORY [CN]) | by applicant | GB2009944 | US4420754 |