EP0551614 - Process for the enhancement of the performance of L-lysine secreting coryneform bacteria [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kircher, Manfred, Dr. Liethstück 16 a W-4800 Bielefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Bachmann, Bernd, Dr. Meyerfeld 10 a W-4806 Werther / DE | [1993/29] | Application number, filing date | 92121027.4 | 10.12.1992 | [1993/29] | Priority number, date | DE19924201085 | 17.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4201085 | [1993/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0551614 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0551614 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551614 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/08, C12N1/20, // (C12N1/20, C12R1:13, 1:15) | [1993/29] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (KR);
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12P13/08 (EP,KR);
C12R2001/13 (EP);
C12R2001/15 (EP);
C12Y203/03001 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [1993/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Leistungsfähigkeit L-Lysin ausscheidender coryneformer Bakterien | [1993/29] | English: | Process for the enhancement of the performance of L-lysine secreting coryneform bacteria | [1993/29] | French: | Procédé d'augmentation de la productivité de bactéries corynéformes dégageant la L-lysine | [1993/29] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 01.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 10.04.1996 | ES | 10.04.1996 | IT | 10.04.1996 | IE | 07.11.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2002/10] | DK | 10.04.1996 | |
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
IE | 07.11.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 10.04.1996 | |
IE | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 10.04.1996 | |
IE | 10.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 10.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2357644 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 1, line 34 - page 3, line 26 * |