EP0552456 - Procedure for determining the speed difference between the wheels of different axles of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöb, Reinhold, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelmstrasse 72 W-7024 Filderstadt / DE | 02 /
Scharnowski, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. August-Lämmle-Strasse 9 W-7012 Fellbach / DE | 03 /
Maass, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Nauheimer Strasse 57 W-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE | 04 /
Eilert, Gerd, Dipl. Ing. Bühlgärten 1 D-7052 Schwaikheim / DE | [1993/30] | Application number, filing date | 92121041.5 | 10.12.1992 | [1993/30] | Priority number, date | DE19924201675 | 23.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4201675 | [1993/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0552456 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0552456 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0552456 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/32 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
B60T8/17551 (EP,US);
B60K23/08 (EP,US);
B60K28/16 (EP,US);
B60T8/172 (EP,US);
B60T8/175 (EP,US);
B60T8/1769 (EP,US);
B60T2270/302 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Geschwindigkeitsunterschiedes zwischen Rädern verschiedener Achsen eines Fahrzeuges | [1993/30] | English: | Procedure for determining the speed difference between the wheels of different axles of a vehicle | [1993/30] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la différence de vitesse entre les roues de différents axes d'un véhicule | [1993/30] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3505455 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * abstract * * page 14, line 18 - page 17, line 2 *; | [A]DE3818511 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 45 - page 2, line 5 * * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 68 *; | [A]DE4019886 (MERCEDES-BENZ) [A] 1,2* the whole document * |