EP0548701 - Electrical connector housing and connector arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Automotive Systems Deutschland GmbH Reinshagenstrasse 1 D-42369 Wuppertal / DE | [1995/47] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states Kabelwerke Reinshagen GmbH Reinshagenstrasse 1 D-42369 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lübstorf, Mario, Dipl.-Ing. Havemannstrasse 4 W-5603 Wülfrath / DE | 02 /
Jorroch, Waldemar Haselnussweg 26 W-5630 Remscheid 11 / DE | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Priebisch, Rüdiger Delphi Automotive Systems Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Reinshagenstrasse 1 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | Priebisch, Rüdiger Delphi Automotive Systems Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Reinshagenstrasse 1 D-42369 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1993/26] | Priebisch, Rüdiger, Dipl.-Ing., Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. (FH) Kabelwerke Reinshagen GmbH Patentabteilung Reinshagenstrasse 1 D-42369 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121105.8 | 11.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | DE19914142525 | 21.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4142525 | [1993/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548701 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548701 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/506, H02B1/048 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
B60R16/0239 (EP);
H01R13/506 (EP);
H05K5/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, PT, SE [1993/26] | Title | German: | Gehäuse, elektrischer Verbinder und Verbinderanordnung | [1993/26] | English: | Electrical connector housing and connector arrangement | [1993/26] | French: | Boîtier de connecteurs électriques et agencement de connexion | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.05.1995 | PT | 17.08.1995 | SE | 17.08.1995 | AT | 11.12.1995 | IE | 31.12.1995 | [1998/38] |
Former [1998/14] | BE | 17.05.1995 | |
PT | 17.08.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
AT | 11.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/28] | BE | 17.05.1995 | |
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
AT | 11.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 17.05.1995 | |
SE | 17.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2153752 (LABINAL); | [A]DE8908758U |