EP0549944 - Multi-resolution graphic representation for interactive visualization applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.02.1997 [1997/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borrell, Paul 253 Watch Hill Road Peekskill, New York 10566 / US | 02 /
Rossignac, Jaroslaw Roman 1956 Lincoln Place Ossining, New York 10562 / US | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/39] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/27] | Herzog, Friedrich Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Birkenstrasse 77 D-71155 Altdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121247.8 | 14.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | US19920816687 | 02.01.1992 Original published format: US 816687 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0549944 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0549944 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/72 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
G06T17/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/27] | Title | German: | Mehrfachauflösendes graphisches System für interaktive Visualisationsanwendungen | [1993/27] | English: | Multi-resolution graphic representation for interactive visualization applications | [1993/27] | French: | Représentation graphique à résolution multiple pour des applications de visualisation inter-active | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 23.12.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MANOHAR ET AL., "template quadtrees for representing region and line data present in binary images", COMPUTER VISION, GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, USA, (199009), vol. 51, no. 3, pages 338 - 354, XP000172437 [A] 1 * figures 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0734-189X(90)90007-I |