EP0547551 - Edible films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 501 Silverside Road Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | [1993/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lazard, Laurent 14 Rue Lainerie F-69005 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Doreau, Albert 573 Avenue Saint Exupery F-69400 Villefranche Sur Saone / FR | 03 /
Nadison, Jeffrey 8 Boulevard du President Edwards F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [1993/25] | Representative(s) | Hagemann, Heinrich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/25] | Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte Hagemann & Kehl Postfach 86 03 29 D-81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121272.6 | 14.12.1992 | [1993/25] | Priority number, date | US19910808393 | 16.12.1991 Original published format: US 808393 | US19920980933 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: US 980933 | [1993/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0547551 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0547551 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L3/00, A23G3/00, A23P1/08 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
A21D13/26 (EP);
A21D15/08 (EP);
A23G3/343 (EP);
A23P20/105 (EP);
A23P20/11 (EP);
A23P20/12 (EP);
A23P20/20 (EP);
C08L3/00 (EP);
A23G2200/06 (EP);
A23G2200/08 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23G3/343, A23G2200/06 (EP);
A23G3/343, A23G2200/08 (EP);
C08L3/00, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/25] | Title | German: | Essbare Folie | [1993/25] | English: | Edible films | [1993/25] | French: | Film comestible | [1993/25] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.11.1997 | DK | 05.11.1997 | LI | 05.11.1997 | LU | 14.12.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 05.11.1997 | |
DK | 05.11.1997 | ||
LI | 05.11.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | DK | 05.11.1997 | |
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
CH | 10.02.1998 | ||
LI | 10.02.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | DK | 05.11.1997 | |
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DK | 05.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63280017 ; | [A]EP0400484 ; | [A]FR2193059 ; | [A]FR2210621 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Week 0189, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 89-003123 & JP-A-63 280 017 (SCHERER R. P. CORP.) 17 November 1988, & JP63280017 A 19881117 |