EP0548746 - Vacuum drying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.09.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKKU INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 25, Higashi Arioka 2-chome Itami-shi Hyogo-ken 664 / JP | For all designated states SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states NIKKU INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 25, Higashi Arioka 2-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken 664 / JP | ||
For all designated states SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Osamu 11-3, Tomatsucho 3-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1993/26] | Weber, Dieter, Dr. Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121300.5 | 15.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910107507U | 26.12.1991 Original published format: JP 10750791 U | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548746 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F26B7/00, F26B15/04 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
F26B15/04 (EP,US);
F26B25/066 (EP,US);
F26B5/04 (KR);
F26B5/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/26] | Title | German: | Vakuumtrocknungsvorrichtung | [1993/26] | English: | Vacuum drying apparatus | [1993/26] | French: | Dispositif de séchage sous vide | [1993/26] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 31.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/43] | 11.06.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2403800 (HOYLER CYRIL N); | [Y]DE728922 (RUDOLF SCHMID DR ING); | [A]US1871339 (ALBERT PEARSON); | [A]EP0143568 (AMERICAN SCREEN PRINTING [US]); | [A]FR2439963 (SMIT OVENS NIJMEGEN BV [NL]); | [A]FR2559883 (TIJOUX PIERRE [FR]); | [A]WO9112945 (INTERDRI LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0311802 (FROEHLICH J W MASCHF [DE]); | [A]EP0177298 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) |