EP0548775 - Water-repellent metal oxide film coated on glass substrate and method of forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube City Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube-city Yamaguchi-pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Osamu No. 246 Kawai-machi Matsusaka City, Mie Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Arai, Hiroaki No. 1027, Isedera-cho Matsusaka City, Mie Prefecture / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/26] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121390.6 | 16.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910343656 | 25.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34365691 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548775 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548775 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00, C03C17/30, C03C17/28 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
C03C17/30 (EP,US);
C03C17/009 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31612 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/26] | Title | German: | Wasserabstossende Metalloxidschicht auf einem Glassubstrat und Herstellungsverfahren | [1993/26] | English: | Water-repellent metal oxide film coated on glass substrate and method of forming same | [1993/26] | French: | Couche hydrofuge d'oxide de métal déposée sur un substrat en verre et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 28.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Request for further processing for: | 06.04.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE4218657 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 20, 20 May 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 191015p, page 344 ; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 24, June 1986, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 211860j, page 281 ; |