EP0548803 - Image forming apparatus having transfer material carrying member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyashiro, Toshiaki, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Haruo, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ochiai, Toshihiko, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/26] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92121478.9 | 17.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | JP19910357054 | 25.12.1991 Original published format: JP 35705491 | JP19920316462 | 30.10.1992 Original published format: JP 31646292 | [1993/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548803 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548803 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
G03G15/1685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/26] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung mit Transferelement für Übertragungsmaterial | [1993/26] | English: | Image forming apparatus having transfer material carrying member | [1993/26] | French: | Dispositiif de formation d'image avec élément porteur du matériau de transfert | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 02.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02291578 ; | [A]JP03154085 ; | [A]EP0323252 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al); | [A]US4522866 (NISHIKAWA MASAJI [JP], et al); | [A]US4674860 (TOKUNAGA HIROSHI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 67 (P-1167)18 February 1991 & JP-A-02 291 578 ( TOSHIBA ) 3 December 1990, & JP02291578 A 19901203 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 384 (P-1258)27 September 1991 & JP-A-03 154 085 ( SEIKO EPSON ) 2 July 1991, & JP03154085 A 19910702 |