EP0557610 - Pipe system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laim, Meinrad Ehrendingerstrasse 3 CH-5400 Ennetbaden / CH | 02 /
Frey, Heinz Fliederweg 4 CH-5737 Menziken / CH | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Kaiser, Helmut, et al c/o Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht - TEI Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Kaiser, Helmut, et al c/o Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht - TEI Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1994/32] | Kaiser, Helmut, Dr., et al ABB Management AG, Abt. TEI - Immaterialgüterrecht CH-5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1993/35] | Kaiser, Helmut, Dr. ABB Management AG Abt. TEI CH-5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 92121549.7 | 18.12.1992 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | DE19924204530 | 15.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4204530 | [1993/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0557610 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0557610 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557610 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16L39/04 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
F16L39/04 (EP,US);
Y10S285/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/35] | Title | German: | Rohrsystem | [1993/35] | English: | Pipe system | [1993/35] | French: | Système de tuyau | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 31.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2366809 (SEEMANN ARTHUR K); | [A]US2490515 (WALTER FERRIS); | [A]DE2525693 (BERG FRITZ HINRICH DIPL ING); | [A]EP0249831 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |