EP0550008 - Use of N-acyl derivatives of aminoalcohols with polycarboxylic acids for the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of pathologies relating to mast cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIFEGROUP S.p.A. Viale Tre Venezie, 44/46 I-35043 Monselice (Padova) / IT | [1993/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Della Valle, Francesco Via Cerato 14 I-35122 Padova / IT | 02 /
Lorenzi, Silvana Piazza Napoli 17 I-35142 Padova / IT | 03 /
Marcolongo, Gabriele Strada Interne, 5 Terra I-35020 Carrara San Giorgia (Padova) / IT | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1993/27] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al Studio Brevetti e Marchi NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.r.l. 33, Viale Bianca Maria I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92121864.0 | 23.12.1992 | [1993/27] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI03509 | 31.12.1991 Original published format: IT MI913509 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0550008 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0550008 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/16 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/16 (EP);
A61K31/165 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/47 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07C233/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/27] | Title | German: | Verwendung von N-Acylderivaten von Aminoalkoholen mit Polycarbonsäuren zur Herstellung eines Arzneimittels zur Behandlung von Mastzellerkrankungen | [1993/27] | English: | Use of N-acyl derivatives of aminoalcohols with polycarboxylic acids for the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of pathologies relating to mast cells | [1993/27] | French: | Utilisation de dérivés N-acylés d'aminoalcools avec des acides polycarboxyliques pour la fabrication d'un médicament pour le traitement de maladies mastocytaires | [1993/27] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/51] | 25.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.1996 | 31.12.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.1997 | 31.12.1999 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - V.ASTRAUSKAS ET AL., "Die Wirkung von antiphlogistischen und immunsuppressiven Präparaten auf Immunreaktionen und Eiweiss-Nukleinsäurestoffwechsel bei Adjuvansarthritis und experimentellen rheumatischen Prozessen", ALLERG. IMMUNOL., (1973), vol. 19, no. 2-4, pages 380 - 387 [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * abstract * * page 383 * | [Y] - JOANN M. MICAN ET AL., "Arthritis and mast cell activation", J.ALLERGY CLIN.IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 86, no. 4(2), pages 677 - 683 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 679, column R, paragraph 4 * | [Y] - HENRY C. POWELL ET AL., "Early changes in experimental allergic neuritis", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (1983), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 332 - 338 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 332, column L * | [Y] - BARRY L. GRUBER, "Immunoglobulin E, mast cells, endogenous antigens, and arthritis", RHEUM. DIS. CLIN. NORTH. AM., (1991), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 333 - 342 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * conclusion *; page 335, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - JOHN BIENENSTOCK ET AL., "Mast cell involvement in various inflammatory processes", AM. REV. RESP. DIS., (1987), vol. 135, no. 6(2), pages S5 - S8 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [DY] - KRÜGER PG ET AL., "Mast cells and multiple sclerosis: a light and electron microscopic study of mast cells in multiple sclerosis emphasizing staining procedures", ACTA NEUROL. SCAND., (1990), vol. 81, pages 31 - 36 [DY] 1-14 * abstract * | [DY] - F.A.KUEHL JR ET AL., "The identification of N-(2-hydroxyethyl)palmitamide as a naturally occuring anti-inflammatory agent", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1957), vol. 79, no. 19, pages 5577 - 5578 [DY] 1-14 * page 5577, column R, paragraph 4 * |