EP0494709 - Signal transmission system with sepatate tree coding for each of the parameters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/29] | Signal transmission system | ||
[1998/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/22] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1992/29] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moulsley, Timothy James c/o Philips Research Laboratories, Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Moody, Colin James, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Moody, Colin James, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92200003.9 | 03.01.1992 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | GB19910000451 | 09.01.1991 Original published format: GB 9100451 | GB19910006785 | 02.04.1991 Original published format: GB 9106785 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494709 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0494709 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494709 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/12, H04L27/00, H03M13/00, H04L27/18 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
H03M13/23 (KR);
H03M13/25 (EP,US);
H03M13/256 (EP,US);
H03M13/35 (EP,US);
H03M13/39 (EP,US);
H04L27/186 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/29] | H03M13/12, H04L27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/29] | Title | German: | Signalübertragungssystem mit getrennter Baum-Kodierung eines jeden Parameters | [1998/22] | English: | Signal transmission system with sepatate tree coding for each of the parameters | [1998/22] | French: | Système de transmission de signal avec codage en arbre de chacun des paramètres | [1998/22] |
Former [1992/29] | Signalübertragungssystem | ||
Former [1992/29] | Signal transmission system | ||
Former [1992/29] | Système de transmission des signaux | Examination procedure | 06.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 11.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.05.1998 | [2002/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0206770 (CODEX CORP [US]); | [A]FR2616986 (MATRA [FR]); | [A]GB2139458 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP) | [Y] - HAGENAUER J., SESHADRI N., SUNDBERG C.-E. W., "THE PERFORMANCE OF RATE-COMPATIBLE PUNCTURED CONVOLUTIONAL CODES FOR DIGITAL MOBILE RADIO.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS., IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ. USA., PISCATAWAY, NJ. USA., (19900701), vol. 38., no. 07., doi:10.1109/26.57495, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 966 - 980., XP000159539 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.57495 |