EP0494717 - Piperidine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Paul Andrew Obere-Stift-Strasse 14 D-6507 Ingelheim / DE | 02 /
Tapp, Stevens James 116 Hazebrouck Road Faversham Kent ME13 7RB / GB | 03 /
Daniels, Nicholas John 18 Grovehurst Road Lemsley, Sittingbourne Kent ME10 2RA / GB | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92200037.7 | 08.01.1992 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | GB19910000505 | 10.01.1991 Original published format: GB 9100505 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494717 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/14, C07D211/18, C07D401/06, C07D417/06, A01N43/40 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
C07D211/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/18 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1992/29] | Title | German: | Piperidinderivate | [1992/29] | English: | Piperidine derivatives | [1992/29] | French: | Dérivés de la pipéridine | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/51] | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0291210 ; | [X]EP0007067 ; | [X]GB801792 (SMITH & NEPHEW); | [XD]EP0244739 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]EP0181618 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0000333 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]EP0372776 (PFIZER [US]); | [Y]EP0379085 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]DE1545552 (ALLEN & HANBURYS LTD); | [X]DE1620074 (KONINKLIJKE PHARMA FAB NV); | [X]GB2083476 (WYETH JOHN & BROTHER LTD); | [X]FR2583263 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [X]EP0359400 (DU PONT [US]); | [X]EP0369335 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]FR2096916 (SYNTHELABO); | [X]FR1421210 (MAY & BAKER LTD); | [X]US2956058 (SHEPARD EDWIN R, et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 67, abstract no. 116443j, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.J. BISHOP et al.: "Conformational analysis of saturated heterocycles. XI. Conformation of 1-methylpiperidines from electric dipole moment studies", & J. CHEM. SOC., B 1967(5), 493-8 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, 1991, page 703, abstract no. 246686r, Columbus, Ohio, US; T. SCHERER et al.: "Comparison of flexibly and rigidly bridged donor-acceptor systems; solvent-induced switching between folded and extended emissive charge-transfer states", & RECL. TRAV. CHIM. PAYS-BAS 1991, 110(3), 95-6 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, 1989, page 708, abstract no. 154160d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & EP-A-291 210 (PFIZER LTD) 17-11-1988, & EP0291210 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, 1980, page 909, abstract no. 46433s, Columbus, Ohio, US; & EP-A-007 067 (CIBA-GEIGY AG) 23-01-1980, & EP0007067 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, 1970, page 322, abstract no. 66236z, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.A.Y. JONES et al.: "Conformational analysis of saturated heterocycles. XXI. Dipole moment studies of 1-ethyl- and 1-isopropylpiperidines and further studies of 1-methylpiperidines, & J. CHEM. SOC. B 1970 (1), 122-7 |