EP0499318 - Depilation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zonneveld, Maarten Harm c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/34] | Representative(s) | Bos, Kornelis Sjoerd, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Bos, Kornelis Sjoerd, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 92200325.6 | 06.02.1992 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | NL19910000267 | 15.02.1991 Original published format: NL 9100267 | [1992/34] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499318 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A45D26/00 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
A45D26/0014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/34] | Title | German: | Epiliergerät | [1992/34] | English: | Depilation apparatus | [1992/34] | French: | Appareil d'épilation électrique | [1992/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0385881 ; | [A]US3103689 |